IA HF414 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 964.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 964.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to child sexual abuse and child sexual assault awareness and prevention.(Formerly HF 192.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to child sexual abuse and child sexual assault awareness and prevention.(Formerly HF 192.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 964. |
2021-02-18 | House | Amendment H-1075 filed. H.J. 491. |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendments H-1064, H-1065 and H-1066 filed. H.J. 471. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 306. |
Same As/Similar To
HF192 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 414.
SF270 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 2:00PM 217 Conference Room.
SF270 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 2:00PM 217 Conference Room.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF414 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF414.html |