IA HF4 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing businesses with income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits for providing child care benefits to employees of the business, and including applicability date provisions.(See HF 370.)
Title
A bill for an act providing businesses with income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits for providing child care benefits to employees of the business, and including applicability date provisions.(See HF 370.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 368. |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 370. |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 287. |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 1:00PM RM 15. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, James and Mitchell. H.J. 87. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 40. |
Same As/Similar To
SF123 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 160.
HF370 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 359.
HF370 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 359.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF4 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF4.html |