IA HF395 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 643.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 643.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to determinations of actual value of certain agricultural property based on productivity and net earning capacity.(See HF 643.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to determinations of actual value of certain agricultural property based on productivity and net earning capacity.(See HF 643.)
Sponsors
Rep. David Kerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 643. |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 489. |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-02-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2021 12:30PM Law Library. |
2021-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: McClintock, Gjerde and Sexton. H.J. 332. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 304. |
Same As/Similar To
SF267 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF643 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1
HF643 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF395 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF395.html |