IA HF393 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to programs and activities under the purview of the department of public health, including effective date provisions and providing for a repeal. (Formerly HSB 25.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to programs and activities under the purview of the department of public health, including effective date provisions and providing for a repeal. (Formerly HSB 25.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1022. |
2017-04-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1007. |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 0. H.J. 1004. |
2017-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1327. H.J. 1003. |
2017-04-11 | House | Senate amendment H-1327 filed. H.J. 983. |
2017-04-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 978. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 965. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 965. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3290, ruled out of order. S.J. 964. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Amendment S-3288 adopted. S.J. 964. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Amendment S-3290 filed. S.J. 927. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amendment S-3288 filed. S.J. 902. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 816. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Jochum, and Shipley. S.J. 622. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 585. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 585. |
2017-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2017-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 626. |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 0. H.J. 611. |
2017-03-13 | House | Amendment H-1144 adopted. H.J. 610. |
2017-03-13 | House | Amendment H-1155 to H-1144 withdrawn. H.J. 610. |
2017-03-07 | House | Amendment H-1155 filed. H.J. 544. |
2017-03-06 | House | Amendment H-1144 filed. H.J. 517. |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 422. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB25 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 411.
SSB1031 (Related) 2017-01-27 - Subcommittee: Costello, Segebart, and Mathis.
SSB1031 (Related) 2017-01-27 - Subcommittee: Costello, Segebart, and Mathis.