IA HF390 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 611.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 611.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to physical activity requirements applicable to students enrolled in public schools and accredited nonpublic schools in kindergarten through grade five.(See HF 611.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to physical activity requirements applicable to students enrolled in public schools and accredited nonpublic schools in kindergarten through grade five.(See HF 611.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 611. |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 487. |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2023 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2023-02-22 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Ehlert, Ingels and Moore, T. H.J. 413. |
2023-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Ehlert, Ingels and Matson. H.J. 413. |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 387. |
Same As/Similar To
HF611 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1030.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF390 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF390.html |