IA HF384 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to alcohol beverage control concerning certain class "C" liquor control licenses, hours of sale of alcoholic beverages on Sunday, and the delivery of certain alcoholic beverages. (Formerly HSB 90.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to alcohol beverage control concerning certain class "C" liquor control licenses, hours of sale of alcoholic beverages on Sunday, and the delivery of certain alcoholic beverages. (Formerly HSB 90.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209. |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1049. |
2021-05-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1095. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1139. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1101. |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 85, nays 1. H.J. 1091. |
2021-05-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1434. H.J. 1090. |
2021-05-05 | House | Senate amendment H-1434 filed. H.J. 1043. |
2021-05-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1041. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1033. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 3. S.J. 1032. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Amendment S-3095 adopted, as amended. S.J. 1032. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Amendment S-3149 adopted. S.J. 1032. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment S-3149 to S-3095 filed. S.J. 876. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3095 filed. S.J. 679. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 679. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2021 1:30PM RM 24A. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Bisignano, and Koelker. S.J. 469. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 417. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 365. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 365. |
2021-02-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 545. |
2021-02-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 418. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 545. |
2021-02-16 | House | Amendment H-1058 adopted. H.J. 417. |
2021-02-11 | House | Amendment H-1058 filed. H.J. 387. |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 297. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB90 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 384.
SSB1171 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 475.
SF475 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Lofgren, and Mathis. S.J. 497.
SSB1171 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 475.
SF475 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Lofgren, and Mathis. S.J. 497.