IA HF377 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 11:00AM House Lounge 1.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act related to a commutation of sentence request from a class "A" felon sentenced to life imprisonment without the possibility of parole, establishing a life imprisonment review committee to make recommendations in the case of a minimum custody level applicant who has served at least twenty-five years in prison, with reconsideration of a sentence upon the governor's request or inaction, and providing expedited review in the case of an applicant's terminal illness and incapacitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act related to a commutation of sentence request from a class "A" felon sentenced to life imprisonment without the possibility of parole, establishing a life imprisonment review committee to make recommendations in the case of a minimum custody level applicant who has served at least twenty-five years in prison, with reconsideration of a sentence upon the governor's request or inaction, and providing expedited review in the case of an applicant's terminal illness and incapacitation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 11:00AM House Lounge 1.
2021-02-09HouseSubcommittee: Hite, Bohannan and Kaufmann. H.J. 331.
2021-02-04HouseIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 296.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback