IA HF354 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 12:15PM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 12:15PM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to licensing sanctions for certain governmental debts by restricting use of social security numbers.
Title
A bill for an act relating to licensing sanctions for certain governmental debts by restricting use of social security numbers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 12:15PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Derry and Deyoe. H.J. 379. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 262. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF354 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF354.html |