IA HF351 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the expungement of a deferred judgment upon a person's discharge from probation. (See HF 702.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the expungement of a deferred judgment upon a person's discharge from probation. (See HF 702.)
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Mohr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 466. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 4:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Hite and Olson. H.J. 379. |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 257. |
Same As/Similar To
HF702 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 755.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF351 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF351.html |