IA HF351 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing that children who are enrolled in the statewide preschool program are of compulsory attendance age. (Formerly HF 144) Effective 7-1-13.
Title
A bill for an act providing that children who are enrolled in the statewide preschool program are of compulsory attendance age. (Formerly HF 144) Effective 7-1-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 949. |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 922. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 922. |
2013-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 809. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 797. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 17. S.J. 796. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 687. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, Wilhelm, Hart, and Johnson. S.J. 507. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 482. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 482. |
2013-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 486. |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays 3. H.J. 478. |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 377. |