IA HF346 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to lobbying activities by political subdivisions.(See HF 822.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to lobbying activities by political subdivisions.(See HF 822.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 866. |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 822. |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 601. |
2021-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2021-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2021 11:15AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Bacon and Wilburn. H.J. 532. |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 277. |
Same As/Similar To
HF822 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF346 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF346.html |