IA HF337 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state employee defense and indemnification from certain claims and actions. (Formerly HSB 10.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state employee defense and indemnification from certain claims and actions. (Formerly HSB 10.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 244. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB10 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 231.
SSB1068 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF339 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
SSB1068 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF339 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF337 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF337.html |