IA HF325 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to eligibility for a property tax exemption for certain property of veterans associations.(Formerly HSB 42.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to eligibility for a property tax exemption for certain property of veterans associations.(Formerly HSB 42.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2022 8:00AM House Lounge 1. |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee: Graber, Gjerde and Nordman. H.J. 130. |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 267. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB42 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 325.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF325 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF325.html |