IA HF323 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools to pay stipends to student teachers.(Formerly HSB 111.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools to pay stipends to student teachers.(Formerly HSB 111.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1023? (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2023 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Salmon, Kraayenbrink, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 425. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education. S.J. 416. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 379. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 379. |
2023-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 407. |
2023-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 596. |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 69, nays 26. H.J. 405. |
2023-02-22 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 405. |
2023-02-22 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1023, yeas 36, nays 59. H.J. 404. |
2023-02-22 | House | Point of order raised on amendment H-1023, ruled not germane. H.J. 404. |
2023-02-21 | House | Amendment H-1023 filed. H.J. 386. |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 354. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB111 (Related) 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 323.