IA HF317 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of education funding for children living in certain facilities and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 106.) Effective date: 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of education funding for children living in certain facilities and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 106.) Effective date: 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037. |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1037. |
2021-04-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 898. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 807. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 807. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Substituted for SF 287. S.J. 806. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 287. S.J. 321. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 321. |
2021-02-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 368. |
2021-02-11 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 382. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 362. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 262. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1071 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 287.
HSB106 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 317.
SF287 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 807.
HSB106 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 317.
SF287 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 807.