IA HF317 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to inclusion of assisted living services under the medical assistance home and community-based services waiver for the elderly. Effective 7-01-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to inclusion of assisted living services under the medical assistance home and community-based services waiver for the elderly. Effective 7-01-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-10 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1388. | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1248. | |
2009-04-07 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1248. | |
2009-03-31 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1078. | |
2009-03-31 | Immediate message. S.J. 903. | |
2009-03-31 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 901. | |
2009-03-25 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 858. | |
2009-03-19 | Subcommittee, Ragan, Boettger, and Wilhelm. S.J. 774. | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 734. | |
2009-03-19 | Message from House. S.J. 734. | |
2009-03-18 | Immediate message. H.J. 884. | |
2009-03-18 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 877. | |
2009-02-16 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 390. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0340C&ga=83 |