IA HF314 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to notification of the general assembly concerning certain state government leases and real property acquisitions. (Formerly HF 139.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to notification of the general assembly concerning certain state government leases and real property acquisitions. (Formerly HF 139.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099. |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1098. |
2021-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 994. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 906. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 904. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Substituted for SF 323. S.J. 904. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 323. S.J. 321. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 321. |
2021-02-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 368. |
2021-02-11 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 382. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 359. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 262. |
Same As/Similar To
HF139 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.