IA HF309 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act restricting public agency disclosure of and access to certain personal information related to tax-exempt organizations, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 28.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act restricting public agency disclosure of and access to certain personal information related to tax-exempt organizations, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 28.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 1209.
2021-05-20HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207.
2021-06-09HouseFiscal note.
2021-04-13HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 940.
2021-04-13SenateImmediate message. S.J. 865.
2021-04-13SenatePassed Senate, yeas 45, nays 1. S.J. 861.
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
2021-03-29SenateFiscal note.
2021-03-24SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 678.
2021-03-16SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-03-15SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2021 8:00AM RM 24A.
2021-02-24SenateFiscal note.
2021-02-24SenateSubcommittee: Johnson, Bolkcom, and Zaun. S.J. 456.
2021-02-23SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 438.
2021-02-23SenateMessage from House. S.J. 438.
2021-02-23HouseImmediate message. H.J. 519.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1204.
2021-02-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 546.
2021-02-23HousePassed House, yeas 84, nays 9. H.J. 510.
2021-02-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 546.
2021-02-23HouseAmendment H-1071 adopted. H.J. 509.
2021-02-17HouseAmendment H-1071 filed. H.J. 472.
2021-02-03HouseFiscal note.
2021-02-01HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 261.

Same As/Similar To

HSB28 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 309.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF309
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF309.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGR/89/attachments/HF309.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/89/attachments/HF309.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1211196.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1214179.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1218221.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1219990.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210223_HJNL.pdf#509
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210324_SJNL.pdf#678
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210413_SJNL.pdf#861

Bill Comments

feedback