IA HF307 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1007.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1007.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the procedures for granting a waterworks or sewer services franchise by a city and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 59.) Effective 4-12-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the procedures for granting a waterworks or sewer services franchise by a city and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 59.) Effective 4-12-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1007. |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 828. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 849. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 846. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 623. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Kraayenbrink, and McCoy. S.J. 433. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 390. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 390. |
2017-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 451. |
2017-03-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 504. |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0. H.J. 441. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 276. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB59 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 268.