IA HF302 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the sales and use tax imposed on the operation of bingo games.
Title
A bill for an act concerning the sales and use tax imposed on the operation of bingo games.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-31 | Subcommittee, Helland, Sands, and Thomas. H.J. 869. | |
2011-02-23 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 348. |