IA HF30 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to golf cart operator exemptions from the state driver's licensing requirements, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to golf cart operator exemptions from the state driver's licensing requirements, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Gerhold, Bush and Sunde. H.J. 282. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 53. |
Same As/Similar To
SF48 (Similar To) 2021-01-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF30 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF30.html |