IA HF3 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 613.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 613.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program integrity, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 613.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program integrity, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 613.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 613. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 472. |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2023 11:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2023-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Meyer, A. and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 72. |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 57. |
Same As/Similar To
HF613 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-2.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF3 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF3.html |