IA HF296 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the regulation of short-term rental properties by counties and cities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the regulation of short-term rental properties by counties and cities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
2023-02-21HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 2:00PM House Lounge.
2023-02-20HouseSubcommittee: Golding, Cooling and Deyoe. H.J. 382.
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 311.

Same As/Similar To

SF347 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback