IA HF296 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1147.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1147.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including by temporarily designating substances as controlled substances, modifying the penalties for imitation controlled substances and certain controlled substances, modifying the controlled substances listed in schedules I, III, and IV, modifying requirements for electronic prescriptions, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 61.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including by temporarily designating substances as controlled substances, modifying the penalties for imitation controlled substances and certain controlled substances, modifying the controlled substances listed in schedules I, III, and IV, modifying requirements for electronic prescriptions, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 61.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1119. |
2017-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1139. |
2017-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1142. |
2017-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 2. H.J. 1129. |
2017-04-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1417. H.J. 1128. |
2017-04-21 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1128. |
2017-04-21 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1425 to Senate amendment H-1417. H.J. 1128. |
2017-04-21 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken and H-1425 not germane to Senate amendment H-1417. H.J. 1128. |
2017-04-21 | House | Point of order raised H-1425 not germane to Senate amendment H-1417. H.J. 1127. |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1425 filed. H.J. 1117. |
2017-04-19 | House | Senate amendment H-1417 filed. H.J. 1099. |
2017-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1087. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1069. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 2. S.J. 1068. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3307 adopted. S.J. 1068. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3351 filed, adopted. S.J. 1068. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3299 withdrawn. S.J. 1068. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Amendment S-3307 filed. S.J. 972. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3299 filed. S.J. 952. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 830. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Shipley. S.J. 661. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 593. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 593. |
2017-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 644. |
2017-03-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed House, ayes 89, nays 4. H.J. 632. |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment H-1105 adopted. H.J. 631. |
2017-03-14 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 631. |
2017-03-14 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 631. |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment H-1105 filed. H.J. 318. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 274. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB61 (Related) 2017-02-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 265.