IA HF295 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement for dually eligible Medicare and Medicaid beneficiaries receiving the Medicare hospice benefit in a nursing facility. (See HF 518.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement for dually eligible Medicare and Medicaid beneficiaries receiving the Medicare hospice benefit in a nursing facility. (See HF 518.)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Fry [R] | Rep. Lisa Heddens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 582. |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 346. |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2019 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Heddens and Salmon. H.J. 235. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 224. |
Same As/Similar To
HF518 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 982.
SSB1232 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF542 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 903.
SSB1232 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF542 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 903.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF295 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF295.html |