IA HF292 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Costello, Mathis, and Sweeney. S.J. 391.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to child care reimbursement rates under the state child care assistance program.(Formerly HSB 2.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to child care reimbursement rates under the state child care assistance program.(Formerly HSB 2.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall amendment H–1030 be adopted? (Y: 36 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateSubcommittee: Costello, Mathis, and Sweeney. S.J. 391.
2021-02-11SenateRead first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 320.
2021-02-11SenateMessage from House. S.J. 320.
2021-02-10HouseImmediate message. H.J. 368.
2021-02-11HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 382.
2021-02-10HousePassed House, yeas 90, nays 4. H.J. 346.
2021-02-11HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 382.
2021-02-10HouseAmendment H-1030 lost. H.J. 345.
2021-02-03HouseAmendment H-1030 filed. H.J. 292.
2021-02-01HouseFiscal note.
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 235.

Same As/Similar To

HSB2 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 292.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback