IA HF285 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 11:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 11:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain political communications and voluntary ethics statements and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain political communications and voluntary ethics statements and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Mckean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: McKean, Deyoe and Lensing. H.J. 253. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 223. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF285 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF285.html |