IA HF28 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 652.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 652.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the intentional avoidance of traffic-control devices, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 652.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the intentional avoidance of traffic-control devices, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 652.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 652. |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 491. |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2021 12:30PM RM 19. |
2021-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Bush, Sunde and Thorup. H.J. 320. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 53. |
Same As/Similar To
HF652 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF28 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF28.html |