IA HF2707 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 941.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 941.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to transactions involving used catalytic converters. (Formerly HSB 751.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to transactions involving used catalytic converters. (Formerly HSB 751.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 941. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935. |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 893. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 933. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 1. S.J. 932. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2441. S.J. 932. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2441. S.J. 910. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 910. |
2024-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 891. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays 0. H.J. 886. |
2024-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8372 adopted. H.J. 886. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8372 filed. H.J. 874. |
2024-04-18 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 848. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB751 (Related) 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2707.
SSB3206 (Related) 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2441.
SF2441 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 933.
SSB3206 (Related) 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2441.
SF2441 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 933.