IA HF265 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to authorized transfers of school district funds to the student activity fund.(See HF 602.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to authorized transfers of school district funds to the student activity fund.(See HF 602.)
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Stone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 645. |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 602. |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 469. |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee: Stone, Dolecheck and Winckler. H.J. 370. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 231. |
Same As/Similar To
HF602 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF265 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF265.html |