IA HF265 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the confidentiality of search warrant information. (Formerly HF 5.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the confidentiality of search warrant information. (Formerly HF 5.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 838. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Kinney, and Sweeney. S.J. 675. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 605. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 605. |
2019-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 535. |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays none. H.J. 605. |
2019-03-13 | House | Amendment H-1026 adopted. H.J. 531. |
2019-03-12 | House | Amendment H-1026 filed. H.J. 526. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 219. |
Same As/Similar To
HF5 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 535.