IA HF2643 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 710.) Effective date: 06/30/2020, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 06/01/2020, 03/18/2020, 06/17/2020, 06/30/2020, 07/01/2019, 07/01/2020, 06/26/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 710.) Effective date: 06/30/2020, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 06/01/2020, 03/18/2020, 06/17/2020, 06/30/2020, 07/01/2019, 07/01/2020, 06/26/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateItem vetoed, signed by Governor
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
2020-06-14SenateNOBA: Final
2020-06-14SenateMessage from House. S.J. 851.
2020-06-14HouseImmediate message. H.J. 781.
2020-06-14HousePassed House, yeas 51, nays 41. H.J. 775.
2020-06-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-8317. H.J. 773.
2020-06-14HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 772.
2020-06-14HouseAmendments H-8321 and H-8322 to Senate amendment H-8317 filed, withdrawn H.J. 772.
2020-06-14HouseAmendment H-8320 to Senate amendment H-8317 lost. H.J. 772.
2020-06-14HouseAmendment H-8320 to Senate amendment H-8317 filed. H.J. 771.
2020-06-14HouseSenate amendment H-8317 filed. H.J. 769.
2020-06-14HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 769.
2020-06-14SenateImmediate message. S.J. 843.
2020-06-14SenatePassed Senate, yeas 30, nays 17. S.J. 842.
2020-06-14SenateAmendment S-5163 adopted. S.J. 842.
2020-06-14SenateDeferred. S.J. 841.
2020-06-14SenateAmendment S-5163 filed. S.J. 840.
2020-06-13SenateNOBA: House Floor
2020-06-13SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 848.
2020-06-13SenateRead first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 804.
2020-06-13SenateMessage from House. S.J. 804.
2020-06-12HouseImmediate message. H.J. 743.
2020-06-12HousePassed House, yeas 52, nays 45. H.J. 743.
2020-06-12HouseAmendments H-8258, H-8259, H-8265, H-8280 and H-8293 withdrawn. H.J. 742.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8275 lost. H.J. 742.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8274 adopted. H.J. 741.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8294 adopted, as amended. H.J. 740.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 740.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8296 to amendment H-8294. H.J. 739.
2020-06-12HousePoint of order raised on H-8296 to amendment H-8294, ruled not germane. H.J. 739.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8296 to amendment H-8294 filed. H.J. 739.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8298 to amendment H-8294 adopted. H.J. 739.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8298 to amendment H-8294 filed. H.J. 738.
2020-06-12HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 738.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8295 to amendment H-8294 adopted. H.J. 738.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 738.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8295 to amendment H-8294. H.J. 737.
2020-06-12HousePoint of order raised on H-8295 to amendment H-8294, ruled not germane. H.J. 737.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8295 to amendment H-8294 filed. H.J. 737.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8276 withdrawn. H.J. 736.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 736.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8304 to amendment H-8276. H.J. 736.
2020-06-12HousePoint of order raised on H-8304 to amendment H-8276, ruled not germane. H.J. 735.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8304 to amendment H-8276 filed. H.J. 735.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 735.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8303 to amendment H-8276. H.J. 734.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8303 to amendment H-8276 filed. H.J. 734.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 734.
2020-06-12HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8302 to H-8276. H.J. 733.
2020-06-12HousePoint of order raised on H-8302 to H-8276, ruled not germane. H.J. 733.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8302 to amendment H-8276 filed. H.J. 733.
2020-06-11HouseAmendments H-8280, H-8293 and H-8294 filed. H.J. 712.
2020-06-11HouseAmendments H-8265, H-8274, H-8275 and H-8276 filed. H.J. 711.
2020-06-10HouseNOBA: House Full Approps
2020-06-10HouseAmendments H-8258 and H-8259 filed. H.J. 690.
2020-06-10HouseIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 672.

Same As/Similar To

HSB710 (Related) 2020-06-10 - Committee report, recommending passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback