IA HF2628 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee: Koelker, Dawson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 509.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee: Koelker, Dawson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 509.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act expanding the sales and use tax exemption allowed for nonprofit blood centers.(Formerly HF 722, HSB 247.)
Title
A bill for an act expanding the sales and use tax exemption allowed for nonprofit blood centers.(Formerly HF 722, HSB 247.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Dawson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 509. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 445. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 445. |
2024-03-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 494. |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays 0. H.J. 492. |
2024-02-29 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 365. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB247 (Related) 2023-04-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 722.
HF722 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 494.
HF722 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 494.