IA HF2627 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to governmental and regulatory matters including the granting and renewal of licenses, certificates, and registrations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2470, HSB 647.) Effective date: 06/25/2020, 01/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to governmental and regulatory matters including the granting and renewal of licenses, certificates, and registrations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2470, HSB 647.) Effective date: 06/25/2020, 01/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 792. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 792. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 756. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 817. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 17. S.J. 815. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Amendment S-5153 filed, lost. S.J. 814. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2418. S.J. 813. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2418. S.J. 803. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 803. |
2020-06-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 743. |
2020-06-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 62, nays 35. H.J. 729. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8250 adopted, as amended. H.J. 728. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8271 to amendment H-8250 withdrawn. H.J. 728. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8266 to amendment H-8250 adopted. H.J. 728. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8263 to amendment H-8250 out of order. H.J. 728. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendments H-8281, H-8282, H-8283, H-8284, H-8285, H-8286 and H-8287 all to amendment H-8250 withdrawn. H.J. 728. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8301B to amendment H-8250 adopted. H.J. 728. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8301A to amendment H-8250 adopted. H.J. 727. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8301 to amendment H-8250 filed. H.J. 726. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8299 to amendment H-8250 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 726. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8267 to amendment H-8250 withdrawn. H.J. 726. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8272 to amendment H-8250 lost. H.J. 725. |
2020-06-11 | House | Amendments H-8281, H-8282, H-8283, H-8284, H-8285, H-8286 and H-8287 filed. H.J. 712. |
2020-06-11 | House | Amendments H-8263, H-8266, H-8267, H-8271, and H-8272 filed. H.J. 711. |
2020-06-10 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-10 | House | Amendment H-8250 filed. H.J. 690. |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 626. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3122 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB647 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 300.
HF2470 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 744.
HSB647 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 300.
HF2470 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 744.