IA HF2623 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to gambling licensees concerning setoff requirements on certain winnings on wagers, payments by credit card, and qualified sponsoring organizations. (Formerly HF 2196, HSB 502.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to gambling licensees concerning setoff requirements on certain winnings on wagers, payments by credit card, and qualified sponsoring organizations. (Formerly HF 2196, HSB 502.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 792.
2020-06-17HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 792.
2020-06-16HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788.
2020-06-16HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788.
2020-06-05HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 648.
2020-06-05SenateImmediate message. S.J. 693.
2020-06-05SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 692.
2020-06-05SenateSubstituted for SF 2411. S.J. 691.
2020-06-04SenateRead first time, attached to companion SF 2411. S.J. 677.
2020-06-04SenateMessage from House. S.J. 677.
2020-06-04HouseImmediate message. H.J. 642.
2020-06-04HousePassed House, yeas 95, nays 2. H.J. 634.
2020-06-04HouseAmendment H-8172 adopted. H.J. 634.
2020-06-03HouseAmendment H-8172 filed. H.J. 632.
2020-06-03HouseFiscal note.
2020-03-12HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 591.
2020-03-12HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 591.

Same As/Similar To

HSB502 (Related) 2020-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 167.
HF2196 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 642.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback