IA HF262 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the refilling of a prescription in emergency situations.(Formerly HSB 51.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the refilling of a prescription in emergency situations.(Formerly HSB 51.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-03-10SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 8:30AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-02-17SenateSubcommittee: Sweeney, Green, and Mathis. S.J. 391.
2021-02-09SenateRead first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 280.
2021-02-09SenateMessage from House. S.J. 280.
2021-02-08HouseImmediate message. H.J. 318.
2021-02-08HousePassed House, yeas 91, nays none. H.J. 314.
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 230.

Same As/Similar To

HSB51 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 262.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback