IA HF2595 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Amendment H-8160 filed. H.J. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Amendment H-8160 filed. H.J. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the construction of child care facilities by providing developers with sales and use tax refunds and income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits, providing for a fee, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2175.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the construction of child care facilities by providing developers with sales and use tax refunds and income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits, providing for a fee, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2175.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment H-8160 filed. H.J. 596. |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment H-8109 filed. H.J. 534. |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8098 filed. H.J. 517. |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8096 filed. H.J. 516. |
2020-03-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 410. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2175 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 407.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2595 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2595.html |