IA HF259 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 870.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 870.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the department of veterans affairs, including county commissions of veteran affairs and cemetery expenditures. (Formerly HSB 103.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the department of veterans affairs, including county commissions of veteran affairs and cemetery expenditures. (Formerly HSB 103.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 870. |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 835. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 633. |
2024-03-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 656. |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays 0. H.J. 649. |
2024-03-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8218. H.J. 648. |
2024-03-19 | House | Senate amendment H-8218 filed. H.J. 626. |
2024-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 609. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 560. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 558. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5068 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 558. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5004 adopted. S.J. 558. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Amendment S-5004 filed. S.J. 262. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 262. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Salmon, Alons, and Dotzler. S.J. 120. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Salmon, Alons, and Bennett. S.J. 372. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Salmon, Alons, and Dotzler. S.J. 362. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 349. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 349. |
2023-02-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 351. |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 350. |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 283. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB103 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 259.
SF236 (Similar To) 2023-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 444. S.J. 443.
SF444 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 1091.
SF236 (Similar To) 2023-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 444. S.J. 443.
SF444 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 1091.