IA HF2588 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the minimum age relative to various activities relating to tobacco, tobacco products, alternative nicotine products, vapor products, and cigarettes, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2135, HSB 557.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the minimum age relative to various activities relating to tobacco, tobacco products, alternative nicotine products, vapor products, and cigarettes, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2135, HSB 557.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 711. |
2020-06-11 | House | SF 2268 substituted. H.J. 703. |
2020-03-02 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 404. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3016 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2268.
HSB557 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 330.
HF2135 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
SF2268 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Fiscal note.
HSB557 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 330.
HF2135 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
SF2268 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2588 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2588.html |