IA HF2585 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Tabled until future meeting. [].
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to health care facilities, including joint training sessions and review of certain citations for nursing facilities, and exceptions to on-site inspections of health care facilities following complaints. (Formerly HSB 691.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to health care facilities, including joint training sessions and review of certain citations for nursing facilities, and exceptions to on-site inspections of health care facilities following complaints. (Formerly HSB 691.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-26 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–8044? (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–8044? (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-11SenateTabled until future meeting. [].
2024-03-07SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2024 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room.
2024-02-29SenateSubcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 424.
2024-02-27SenateRead first time, referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 390.
2024-02-27SenateMessage from House. S.J. 390.
2024-02-26HouseImmediate message. H.J. 397.
2024-03-04HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 496.
2024-02-26HousePassed House, yeas 87, nays 8. H.J. 394.
2024-02-26HouseAmendment H-8034 adopted. H.J. 394.
2024-02-26HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 393.
2024-02-26HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-8044, yeas 36, nays 59. H.J. 393.
2024-02-26HousePoint of order raised on amendment H-8044, ruled not germane. H.J. 392.
2024-02-22HouseAmendment H-8044 filed. H.J. 383.
2024-02-21HouseAmendment H-8034 filed. H.J. 364.
2024-02-19HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 291.

Same As/Similar To

HSB691 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2585.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback