IA HF2579 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, the technology reinvestment fund, and the sports wagering receipts fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Effective date: 07/01/2022, 06/17/2022. Applicability date: 06/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, the technology reinvestment fund, and the sports wagering receipts fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Effective date: 07/01/2022, 06/17/2022. Applicability date: 06/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8341 be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8339 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8338 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8337 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8336 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8341 be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8339 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8338 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8337 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Shall amendment H–8336 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 945. |
2022-06-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 894. |
2022-05-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 899. |
2022-06-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-24 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2022-05-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 81, nays 3. H.J. 895. |
2022-05-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8381. H.J. 895. |
2022-05-23 | House | Senate amendment H-8381 filed. H.J. 904. |
2022-05-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 888. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 881. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 878. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5153 adopted, as amended. S.J. 878. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5162 to S-5153 filed, adopted. S.J. 878. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5153 filed. S.J. 856. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 856. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Lofgren, and Petersen. S.J. 752. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 713. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 713. |
2022-04-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 811. |
2022-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 901. |
2022-04-05 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 794. |
2022-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 901. |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8337, yeas 37, nays 58, filed, lost. H.J. 793. |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8319 filed, adopted. H.J. 793. |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8321 filed, adopted. H.J. 793. |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8318 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 792. |
2022-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 901. |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8338, yeas 37, nays 58, filed, lost. H.J. 792. |
2022-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 900. |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8336, yeas 37, nays 58, filed, lost. H.J. 791. |
2022-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 900. |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8339, yeas 38, nays 57, filed, lost. H.J. 790. |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8340 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 790. |
2022-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 900. |
2022-05-20 | House | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8341, yeas 39, nays 57, filed, lost. H.J. 789. |
2022-05-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 900. |
2022-04-07 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2022-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8342, yeas 39, nays 58, filed, lost. H.J. 788. |
2022-03-30 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2022-03-29 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 730. |