IA HF257 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the distribution of certain funds for abortions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the distribution of certain funds for abortions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2019-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Salmon, Osmundson and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 235. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 218. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF257 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF257.html |