IA HF2560 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and making related statutory changes, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 07/01/2022, 06/17/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and making related statutory changes, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 07/01/2022, 06/17/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 52 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall amendment H–8243, to amendment H–8220, be adopted? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall amendment H–8224 be adopted? (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall amendment H–8210 be adopted? (Y: 40 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall amendment H–8209 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall amendment H–8243, to amendment H–8220, be adopted? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall amendment H–8224 be adopted? (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall amendment H–8210 be adopted? (Y: 40 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall amendment H–8209 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 945. |
2022-06-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 894. |
2022-05-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 887. |
2022-06-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-24 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2022-05-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 52, nays 31. H.J. 883. |
2022-05-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8373. H.J. 883. |
2022-05-23 | House | Senate amendment H-8373 filed. H.J. 904. |
2022-05-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 879. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 862. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 12. S.J. 860. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5150 adopted. S.J. 860. |
2022-05-20 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5150 filed. S.J. 849. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 849. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Mathis, and Williams. S.J. 645. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 619. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 619. |
2022-03-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 654. |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 61, nays 35. H.J. 650. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8216 withdrawn. H.J. 650. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8211 withdrawn. H.J. 649. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8209, yeas 38, nays 58, lost. H.J. 649. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8210, yeas 40, nays 55, lost. H.J. 648. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8220 adopted, as amended. H.J. 648. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8243 to amendment H-8220, yeas 96, nays 0, filed, adopted. H.J. 647. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8222 withdrawn. H.J. 646. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8224, yeas 36, nays 60, lost. H.J. 646. |
2022-03-22 | House | Amendments H-8216, H-8220, H-8222 and H-8224 filed. H.J. 628. |
2022-03-21 | House | Amendments H-8209, H-8210 and H-8211 filed. H.J. 602. |
2022-03-18 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 591. |
2022-03-15 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 570. |