IA HF2558 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch. Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch. Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 27 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5171 to amendment S–5149 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Shall amendment H–8201 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 27 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5171 to amendment S–5149 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Shall amendment H–8201 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | NOBA: Final |
2022-06-17 | House | Item vetoed, signed by Governor. H.J. 947. |
2022-06-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 923. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 920. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 27, nays 16. S.J. 920. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5177. S.J. 920. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5177. S.J. 915. |
2022-05-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 922. |
2022-06-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-24 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2022-05-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 939. |
2022-05-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 55, nays 38. H.J. 922. |
2022-05-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8387, as amended. H.J. 921. |
2022-05-24 | House | Amendment H-8390 to Senate amendment H-8387 filed, adopted. H.J. 921. |
2022-05-24 | House | Amendment H-8389 to Senate amendment H-8387 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 921. |
2022-05-24 | House | Senate amendment H-8387 filed. H.J. 940. |
2022-05-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 905. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 888. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 28, nays 16. S.J. 887. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5149 adopted. S.J. 887. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5149, ruled in order. S.J. 887. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5172 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 886. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5171 filed, lost. S.J. 886. |
2022-05-20 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5149 filed. S.J. 849. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 849. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Kraayenbrink, Bolkcom, Celsi, Costello, Cournoyer, Dotzler, Edler, Garrett, Guth, Johnson, Klimesh, Koelker, Lofgren, Mathis, Petersen, Ragan, Reichman, Rozenboom, Smith, J., Taylor, T., and Williams. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Kraayenbrink, and T. Taylor. S.J. 623. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 595. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 595. |
2022-03-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2022-03-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays 4. H.J. 616. |
2022-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8207 withdrawn. H.J. 616. |
2022-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8201, yeas 37, nays 57, lost. H.J. 615. |
2022-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8199 withdrawn. H.J. 615. |
2022-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8206 adopted. H.J. 615. |
2022-03-21 | House | Amendments H-8206 and H-8207 filed. H.J. 602. |
2022-03-21 | House | Amendments H-8199 and H-8201 filed. H.J. 601. |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 591. |
2022-03-16 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2022-03-15 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 570. |