IA HF2557 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure-related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund. Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure-related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund. Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | NOBA: Final |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 945. |
2022-06-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 879. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 874. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 871. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 758. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Lofgren, and Petersen. S.J. 623. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 595. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 595. |
2022-03-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2022-03-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays 2. H.J. 614. |
2022-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8189 adopted. H.J. 614. |
2022-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8190 withdrawn. H.J. 613. |
2022-03-17 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 591. |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendments H-8189 and H-8190 filed. H.J. 589. |
2022-03-15 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 569. |