IA HF2556 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor. H.J. 796.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act concerning governmental real property and official publications. (Formerly HF 2299.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act concerning governmental real property and official publications. (Formerly HF 2299.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateVetoed by Governor. H.J. 796.
2020-06-30SenateVetoed by Governor. H.J. 796.
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788.
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14SenateMessage from House. S.J. 851.
2020-06-14HouseImmediate message. H.J. 781.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HousePassed House, yeas 52, nays 40. H.J. 781.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-8315. H.J. 780.
2020-06-13HouseSenate amendment H-8315 filed. H.J. 767.
2020-06-13HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 756.
2020-06-13SenateImmediate message. S.J. 830.
2020-06-13SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 861.
2020-06-13SenatePassed Senate, yeas 33, nays 14. S.J. 830.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5116 adopted. S.J. 830.
2020-06-09SenateAmendment S-5116 filed. S.J. 719.
2020-06-09SenateCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 719.
2020-03-10SenateSubcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Giddens. S.J. 564.
2020-03-05SenateRead first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 536.
2020-03-05SenateMessage from House. S.J. 536.
2020-03-04HouseImmediate message. H.J. 484.
2020-03-10HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 566.
2020-03-09HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 532.
2020-03-04HousePassed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 482.
2020-02-25HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 355.

Same As/Similar To

HF2299 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback