IA HF2540 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act concerning alcoholic beverage control, establishing a charity beer, spirits, and wine event permit, providing for alcoholic beverages sales, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 683.) Effective date: 06/29/2020, 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act concerning alcoholic beverage control, establishing a charity beer, spirits, and wine event permit, providing for alcoholic beverages sales, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 683.) Effective date: 06/29/2020, 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
2020-06-13SenateMessage from House. S.J. 816.
2020-06-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 754.
2020-06-13HousePassed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 750.
2020-06-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-8305. H.J. 749.
2020-06-12HouseSenate amendment H-8305 filed. H.J. 745.
2020-06-12HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 723.
2020-06-12SenateImmediate message. S.J. 798.
2020-06-12SenatePassed Senate, yeas 44, nays 4. S.J. 797.
2020-06-12SenateAmendment S-5113B adopted. S.J. 797.
2020-06-12SenateAmendment S-5113A adopted. S.J. 796.
2020-06-12SenateAmendment S-5145 to S-5113 filed, adopted. S.J. 796.
2020-06-09SenateAmendment S-5113 filed. S.J. 719.
2020-06-09SenateCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 719.
2020-03-12SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-03-11SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2020 12:00PM RM 315.
2020-03-10SenateSubcommittee: Johnson, Celsi, and Whiting. S.J. 564.
2020-03-05SenateRead first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 536.
2020-03-05SenateMessage from House. S.J. 536.
2020-03-04HouseImmediate message. H.J. 480.
2020-03-10HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 566.
2020-03-09HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 532.
2020-03-04HousePassed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 479.
2020-03-04HouseAmendment H-8044 adopted. H.J. 478.
2020-02-27HouseAmendment H-8044 filed. H.J. 407.
2020-02-25HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 352.

Same As/Similar To

HSB683 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 330.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback