IA HF2535 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 679.) Effective date: 06/17/2020, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 07/01/2019.
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 679.) Effective date: 06/17/2020, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 07/01/2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 791. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 791. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 610. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 643. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 641. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2340. S.J. 641. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2340. S.J. 527. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 527. |
2020-03-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 480. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 474. |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 339. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3134 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2340.
HSB679 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322.
SF2340 (Similar To) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 642.
HSB679 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322.
SF2340 (Similar To) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 642.