IA HF2529 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Edler. S.J. 544.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Edler. S.J. 544.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a state-funded psychiatry residency program at various state institutions, creating a program fund, and making appropriations.(Formerly HF 2157, HSB 532.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to a state-funded psychiatry residency program at various state institutions, creating a program fund, and making appropriations.(Formerly HF 2157, HSB 532.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Edler. S.J. 544. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 541. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 541. |
2022-03-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 581. |
2022-03-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 625. |
2022-03-17 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 570. |
2022-02-28 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 394. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB532 (Related) 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2157.
HF2157 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 581.
HF2157 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 581.