IA HF2529 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to confidential communications between a peer support group counselor and specified individuals. (Formerly HF 2333.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to confidential communications between a peer support group counselor and specified individuals. (Formerly HF 2333.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Kinney, and Whiting. S.J. 543. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 527. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 527. |
2020-03-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 473. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 472. |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 336. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2333 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.